NY S05674 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires assessors using the comparable sales method for assessments to consider certain comparable properties in formulating the assessment.
Title
Requires assessors using the comparable sales method for assessments to consider certain comparable properties in formulating the assessment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4752c |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.181 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.803 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5674 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.506 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-02 | Senate | print number 4752b |
2019-05-02 | Senate | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-25 | Senate | print number 4752a |
2019-04-25 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5674A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4752B |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.803 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04752 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT