NY S05716 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5716B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5716B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes emergency medical care personnel to provide basic first aid to dogs and cats.
Title
Authorizes emergency medical care personnel to provide basic first aid to dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5716B |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5716A |
2018-05-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1151 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07812 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES