NY S05718 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that expenditures made by the county of Monroe or the Rochester city school district for preventive services described in paragraph b of this subdivision shall be subject to sixty-five percent state reimbursement; further provides that one hundred percent of Monroe county's local portion of claims for such services are comprised of privately donated funds.
Title
Provides that expenditures made by the county of Monroe or the Rochester city school district for preventive services described in paragraph b of this subdivision shall be subject to sixty-five percent state reimbursement; further provides that one hundred percent of Monroe county's local portion of claims for such services are comprised of privately donated funds.
Sponsors
Sen. James Alesi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5718A |
2012-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2011-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08417 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - print number 8417a