NY S05732 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7588
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7588
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the provision of enriched social adult day services and authorizes the director to establish an application process where eligible entities may apply to offer enriched and/or optional services and authorizes the director to make grants to eligible entities.
Title
Relates to the provision of enriched social adult day services and authorizes the director to establish an application process where eligible entities may apply to offer enriched and/or optional services and authorizes the director to make grants to eligible entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7588 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1936 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A07588 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - signed chap.448