NY S05732 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines autocycle and specifies provisions applicable to such motor vehicles.
Title
Defines autocycle and specifies provisions applicable to such motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.969 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00202 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation