NY S05757 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the position of an insurance liaison on the disaster preparedness commission to be appointed by the governor and serve as a non-voting member.
Title
Establishes the position of an insurance liaison on the disaster preparedness commission to be appointed by the governor and serve as a non-voting member.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.171 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.759 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07820 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations