NY S05771 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fees for gift cards; limits the amount a merchant may charge for the gift card; and prohibits the expiration of such gift cards.
Title
Relates to fees for gift cards; limits the amount a merchant may charge for the gift card; and prohibits the expiration of such gift cards.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.580 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-01-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5771A |
2020-01-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08652 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - print number 8652a