NY S05789 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Promotes the development, provision and accessibility of telehealth/telemedicine services in New York state; establishes a telehealth/telemedicine development and research grant fund.
Title
Promotes the development, provision and accessibility of telehealth/telemedicine services in New York state; establishes a telehealth/telemedicine development and research grant fund.
Sponsors
Sen. David Valesky [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] |
Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1494 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5789B |
2016-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5789A |
2016-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10436 (Same As) 2016-05-27 - referred to health