NY S05809 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5809A
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes standards for caseloads for child protective services workers; requires the state to pay for one hundred percent of the costs associated with compliance of such caseload standard; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes standards for caseloads for child protective services workers; requires the state to pay for one hundred percent of the costs associated with compliance of such caseload standard; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 5809A
2020-03-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2020-03-10SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES

Same As/Similar To

A07581 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback