NY S05817 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A191B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A191B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the recycling of film plastic.
Title
Relates to the recycling of film plastic.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A191B |
2014-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.169 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-10-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5817A |
2013-10-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00191 (Same As) 2014-12-17 - signed chap.481