NY S05834 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - SIGNED CHAP.514
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - SIGNED CHAP.514
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates the scope, manner and performance of review of claims by utilization review agents.
Title
Regulates the scope, manner and performance of review of claims by utilization review agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.514 |
2013-11-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.20 |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a2691b |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1551 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02691 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5834