NY S05844 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes school buses and paratransit vehicles types A(I) and A(II) used solely for the transportation of children or people with disabilities to travel on parkways.
Title
Authorizes school buses and paratransit vehicles types A(I) and A(II) used solely for the transportation of children or people with disabilities to travel on parkways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.597 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1724 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08113 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation