NY S05915 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5915B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5915B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Mohawk Valley and Niagara county assessment relief act" authorizing eligible municipalities in certain counties to provide assessment relief for property which was catastrophically damaged by severe weather.
Title
Enacts the "Mohawk Valley and Niagara county assessment relief act" authorizing eligible municipalities in certain counties to provide assessment relief for property which was catastrophically damaged by severe weather.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5915B |
2014-02-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-09-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5915A |
2013-09-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2013-07-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08124 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - print number 8124a