NY S05915 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office for the prevention of domestic violence to distribute informational materials on recognizing economic abuse and the support available to victims.
Title
Requires the office for the prevention of domestic violence to distribute informational materials on recognizing economic abuse and the support available to victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.537 |
2023-10-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.579 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a5347 |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.775 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A05347 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - substituted by s5915