NY S05966 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Nicholas Budney, a town of Hamburg police officer, to receive certain credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes Nicholas Budney, a town of Hamburg police officer, to receive certain credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-12-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5966B |
2019-12-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-09-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5966A |
2019-09-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |