NY S06010 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duty to report incidents to 911 and the county district attorney's office.
Title
Relates to the duty to report incidents to 911 and the county district attorney's office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1366 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1904 |
2015-06-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08307 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to mental health
S06010 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S06010 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES