NY S06012 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to services provided by school-based health centers to be provided to medical assistance recipients through managed care programs.
Title
Relates to services provided by school-based health centers to be provided to medical assistance recipients through managed care programs.
Sponsors
Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.235 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.450 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7866 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1157 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07866 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s6012