NY S06024 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a returning veterans tax credit for businesses that hire veterans and wounded veterans; such tax credit is worth $3,000 per veteran hired or $4,000 for every wounded veteran hired and the total benefit shall not exceed $15,000 annually.
Title
Establishes a returning veterans tax credit for businesses that hire veterans and wounded veterans; such tax credit is worth $3,000 per veteran hired or $4,000 for every wounded veteran hired and the total benefit shall not exceed $15,000 annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.889 |
2012-05-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6024C |
2012-05-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-04-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6024B |
2012-04-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6024A |
2012-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08837 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means