NY S06039 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts pension and annuity disbursements of up to one hundred thousand dollars from the gross income of qualifying individuals impacted by the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Exempts pension and annuity disbursements of up to one hundred thousand dollars from the gross income of qualifying individuals impacted by the COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A05369 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means