NY S06078 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 6078A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 6078A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the imposition of penalties and remedies in suits brought for the vindication of civil rights or human rights; reasonable attorney's fee, reasonable expert fees.
Title
Relates to the imposition of penalties and remedies in suits brought for the vindication of civil rights or human rights; reasonable attorney's fee, reasonable expert fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6078A |
2020-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00292 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES