NY S06127 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for mutual aid to and by member states of the Northeastern Interstate Forest Fire Protection Compact and states which are members of other regional forest fire protection compacts.
Title
Provides for mutual aid to and by member states of the Northeastern Interstate Forest Fire Protection Compact and states which are members of other regional forest fire protection compacts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.414 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.601 |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | substituted for a9652 |
2012-02-29 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2012-02-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.188 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09652 (Same As) 2012-05-21 - substituted by s6127