NY S06131 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to removing the social security offset for New York city uniformed correction officers who are members of the New York city uniformed correction/sanitation revised plan.
Title
Relates to removing the social security offset for New York city uniformed correction officers who are members of the New York city uniformed correction/sanitation revised plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6131B |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6131A |
2019-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |