NY S06145 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6145A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6145A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the state sales tax on wireless telephone services and provides for a local option of imposing such taxes.
Title
Removes the state sales tax on wireless telephone services and provides for a local option of imposing such taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6145A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08226 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 8226a