NY S06192 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes any person licensed as a physician, physician's assistant, massage therapist, physical therapist, chiropractor, dentist, optometrist, nurse, nurse practitioner or podiatrist in another state or territory and appointed by the World Triathlon Corporation to practice his or her profession in this state in connection with an athletic event sanctioned by such corporation.
Title
Authorizes any person licensed as a physician, physician's assistant, massage therapist, physical therapist, chiropractor, dentist, optometrist, nurse, nurse practitioner or podiatrist in another state or territory and appointed by the World Triathlon Corporation to practice his or her profession in this state in connection with an athletic event sanctioned by such corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.77 |
2012-06-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.646 |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a8982 |
2012-02-14 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2012-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.165 |
2012-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08982 (Same As) 2012-05-30 - substituted by s6192