NY S06210 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on October 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the New York state prescription medication cost containment program.
Title
Relates to establishing the New York state prescription medication cost containment program.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Antoine Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-05-14 | PRINT NUMBER 6210B | |
2010-05-14 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | |
2010-05-04 | PRINT NUMBER 6210A | |
2010-05-04 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | |
2010-04-13 | CONSIDERED BY COMMITTEE - DEFEATED | |
2010-02-26 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | |
2009-10-09 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A9207 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - print number 9207b