NY S06212 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Gives the state fire administrator the authority to waive certain membership requirements affecting non-residents who want to join the volunteer fire company.
Title
Gives the state fire administrator the authority to waive certain membership requirements affecting non-residents who want to join the volunteer fire company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.886 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08935 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - referred to local governments