NY S06285 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9034B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9034B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a state agency from entering into contracts for advertising mailings for products and services of entities which relate directly to the authority of such agency.
Title
Prohibits a state agency from entering into contracts for advertising mailings for products and services of entities which relate directly to the authority of such agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9034B |
2012-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6285A |
2012-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.958 |
2012-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09034 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - tabled