NY S06332 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.300
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.300
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Chateaugay lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates the Chateaugay lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.300 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.160 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a8446a |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.856 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6332A |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08446 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6332a