NY S06335 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Syracuse Hancock International Airport to hire and promote employees on a permanent basis.
Title
Authorizes the Syracuse Hancock International Airport to hire and promote employees on a permanent basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2024-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.507 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1520 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6335A |
2023-05-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07657 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees