NY S06379 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of Peconic Bay community preservation funds for the preservation of lands necessary to protect fisheries and water dependent uses essential to maintain and enhance maritime heritage.
Title
Authorizes the use of Peconic Bay community preservation funds for the preservation of lands necessary to protect fisheries and water dependent uses essential to maintain and enhance maritime heritage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.255 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.690 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6379 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.317 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.562 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | rules report cal.562 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-18 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-07 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8195 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.690 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08195 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.255