NY S06402 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4969
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4969
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate how to regulate artificial intelligence, robotics and automation; repeals such commission.
Title
Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate how to regulate artificial intelligence, robotics and automation; repeals such commission.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4969 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1206 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A04969 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - tabled