NY S06448 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Jessica Strizzi.
Title
Grants retroactive Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Jessica Strizzi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.200 |
2017-11-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.515 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7919a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1812 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6448A |
2017-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07919 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6448a