NY S06457 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9544
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9544
Summary
Creates an executive ethics and compliance commission and the New York state commission on lobbying ethics and compliance; establishes the the legislative office of ethics investigation and joint legislative commission on ethics standards; relates to ethics reports financial disclosure of public officers; relates to a state board of elections enforcement unit and counsel; relates to personal use of campaign funds, filing requirements, political communication, independent expenditure reporting, enforcement proceedings, and penalties for violations.
Title
Creates an executive ethics and compliance commission and the New York state commission on lobbying ethics and compliance; establishes the the legislative office of ethics investigation and joint legislative commission on ethics standards; relates to ethics reports financial disclosure of public officers; relates to a state board of elections enforcement unit and counsel; relates to personal use of campaign funds, filing requirements, political communication, independent expenditure reporting, enforcement proceedings, and penalties for violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-20 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9544 | |
2010-01-20 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.18 | |
2010-01-20 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-01-19 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-13 | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09544 (Same As) 2010-02-08 - MOTION TO RECONSIDER - TABLED
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06457&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |