NY S06477 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to injunctive relief in improper practice cases, in relation to extending the effectiveness of provisions contained therein.
Title
Relates to injunctive relief in improper practice cases, in relation to extending the effectiveness of provisions contained therein.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7964 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1741 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07964 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - signed chap.70