NY S06498 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization for the county of Greene to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2016.
Title
Extends the authorization for the county of Greene to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.222 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.355 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8750 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.682 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08750 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6498