NY S06503 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the revocatory effect of divorce.
Title
Relates to the revocatory effect of divorce.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.899 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1007 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07798 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to judiciary