NY S06507 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the aggregate cap on liabilities for life insurers under the life insurance guaranty corporation for the purposes of determining assessments on insurers.
Title
Relates to increasing the aggregate cap on liabilities for life insurers under the life insurance guaranty corporation for the purposes of determining assessments on insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.217 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.600 |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | substituted for a9607 |
2012-03-30 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2012-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-29 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.479 |
2012-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6507A |
2012-03-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09607 (Same As) 2012-05-21 - substituted by s6507a