NY S06528 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of distinctive plates for members of Kiwanis International.
Title
Authorizes the issuance of distinctive plates for members of Kiwanis International.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2014-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.825 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08258 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to transportation