NY S06528 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.664
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.664
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the secretary of state to promulgate rules and regulations requiring that education and testing for cosmetologists or natural hair stylists include education and testing regarding the provision of services to individuals with all hair types and textures, including, but not limited to, various curl or wave patterns, hair strand thicknesses, and volumes of hair.
Title
Requires the secretary of state to promulgate rules and regulations requiring that education and testing for cosmetologists or natural hair stylists include education and testing regarding the provision of services to individuals with all hair types and textures, including, but not limited to, various curl or wave patterns, hair strand thicknesses, and volumes of hair.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.664 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.654 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a6927a |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1114 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6528A |
2023-05-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06927 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - substituted by s6528a