NY S06538 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends employer contributions to the interest assessment surcharge fund until December 31, 2023.
Title
Suspends employer contributions to the interest assessment surcharge fund until December 31, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07211 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in labor