NY S06569 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for flood victims in the town of West Seneca, county of Erie in the amount of property taxes paid on property which sustained substantial damage as a result of flooding in the period from January 6, 2014 to and including January 13, 2014.
Title
Establishes an income tax credit for flood victims in the town of West Seneca, county of Erie in the amount of property taxes paid on property which sustained substantial damage as a result of flooding in the period from January 6, 2014 to and including January 13, 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08789 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - referred to ways and means