NY S06595 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the population of a village; amends population from 500 to 1000 regular inhabitants for purposes of a village.
Title
Relates to the population of a village; amends population from 500 to 1000 regular inhabitants for purposes of a village.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1750 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |