NY S06623 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing penalties for deceptive trade practices and unlawful acts by an automobile broker business.
Title
Relates to increasing penalties for deceptive trade practices and unlawful acts by an automobile broker business.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.372 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.525 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10081 |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2016-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.606 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A10081 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s6623