NY S06641 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting reasonable automobile tire inflation machine fees when such machine is either coin-operated or credit card device-operated.
Title
Relates to permitting reasonable automobile tire inflation machine fees when such machine is either coin-operated or credit card device-operated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.599 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08280 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to economic development