NY S06653 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6489A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6489A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a charge-back of refunds of taxes levied by a school district to municipal public libraries and special district public libraries.
Title
Provides for a charge-back of refunds of taxes levied by a school district to municipal public libraries and special district public libraries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6489A |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1788 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6653A |
2021-05-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06489 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - signed chap.503