NY S06666 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the care and treatment of injured employees by licensed or certified acupuncturists under the workers' compensation program.
Title
Authorizes the care and treatment of injured employees by licensed or certified acupuncturists under the workers' compensation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.354 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.152 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a2023a |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1793 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02023 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6666