NY S06698 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9872
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9872
Summary
Makes permanent the provisions of chapter 591 of the laws of 2001 relating to limiting the check cashing exemption for national banks and other regulated entities.
Title
Makes permanent the provisions of chapter 591 of the laws of 2001 relating to limiting the check cashing exemption for national banks and other regulated entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] | Sen. Brian Foley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9872 | |
2010-02-23 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-02-22 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-02-09 | 1ST REPORT CAL.110 | |
2010-01-28 | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A9872 (Same As) 2010-04-29 - tabled
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06698&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |