NY S06698 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state pre-paid tuition plan by which a person may contribute to an account for the pre-payment of college tuition, tax free.
Title
Establishes the New York state pre-paid tuition plan by which a person may contribute to an account for the pre-payment of college tuition, tax free.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1217 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6698A |
2014-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09656 (Same As) 2014-05-14 - referred to higher education