NY S06702 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates the East Amherst Fire Department Benevolent Association; provides for its powers and duties.
Title
Incorporates the East Amherst Fire Department Benevolent Association; provides for its powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.378 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.617 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7645 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1569 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07645 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6702