NY S06707 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.577
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.577
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of the North Shore water authority to protect, preserve and enhance the quality and quantity of the water within its supply area; defines terms; creates the water authority of the North Shore district and the water authority of North Shore; establishes the powers, bonds and moneys of the authority; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to the establishment of the North Shore water authority to protect, preserve and enhance the quality and quantity of the water within its supply area; defines terms; creates the water authority of the North Shore district and the water authority of North Shore; establishes the powers, bonds and moneys of the authority; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.577 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.619 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7654 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1464 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07654 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s6707